US HB5452 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the applicability of the waiver of the prohibition against duplication of benefits for disaster relief recipients following Superstorm Sandy. Under current law, the waiver period extends from January 1, 2016, through December 31, 2021. begins that period on October 1, 2012, through December 31, 2021. This change would permit individuals who suffered losses resulting from Superstorm Sandy and who initially applied for and received federal benefits, including Small Business Administration disaster relief loans, to receive additional federal benefits, including funds under the Department of Housing and Urban Development Block Grant for Disaster Relief (CDBG-DR), without having to repay such additional benefits.
Title
Sandy Duplication of Benefits Fairness Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-12-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-12-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2734 (Same As) 2019-10-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing and community development funding
Housing finance and home ownership
Natural disasters
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Small business
Emergency management
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing and community development funding
Housing finance and home ownership
Natural disasters
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Small business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5452/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5452/BILLS-116hr5452ih.pdf |