US HB5428 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 380.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 380.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Energy Independence and Security Act of 2007 and the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to direct Federal research on grid modernization and security, and for other purposes.
Title
Grid Modernization Research and Development Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 380. |
2020-08-11 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-474. |
2020-02-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-12-19 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2019-12-19 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-12-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-12-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2019-12-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Atmospheric science and weather
Building construction
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Emergency planning and evacuation
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental technology
Fires
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Infrastructure development
Lighting, heating, cooling
Natural disasters
Public utilities and utility rates
Public-private cooperation
Regional and metropolitan planning
Research administration and funding
Research and development
State and local government operations
Technology assessment
Technology transfer and commercialization
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Atmospheric science and weather
Building construction
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Emergency planning and evacuation
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental technology
Fires
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Infrastructure development
Lighting, heating, cooling
Natural disasters
Public utilities and utility rates
Public-private cooperation
Regional and metropolitan planning
Research administration and funding
Research and development
State and local government operations
Technology assessment
Technology transfer and commercialization