US HB542 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting Research and Development for First Responders Act This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security to designate the National Urban Security Technology Laboratory as a science and technology laboratory responsible for testing and evaluating emerging technologies and conducting research and development to assist emergency response providers in preparing for, and protecting against, threats of terrorism. The laboratory shall (1) conduct tests, evaluations, and assessments of current and emerging technologies for emergency response providers, including cybersecurity of such technologies that can connect to the Internet; (2) conduct research and development on radiological and nuclear response and recovery; and (3) act as a technical advisor to emergency response providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting Research and Development for First Responders Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-10 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 242 (Y: 395 N: 3 NV: 34 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2019-06-10HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-06-10HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 3 (Roll no. 242). (text: CR H4364)
2019-06-10HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4375-4376)
2019-06-10HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-06-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 542.
2019-06-10HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4364-4365)
2019-06-10HouseMiss Rice (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-05-28HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 62.
2019-05-28HouseReported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-87.
2019-05-15HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2019-05-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-15HouseSubcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation Discharged.
2019-02-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation.
2019-01-14HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback