US HB5412 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 114.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Intelligence Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2022

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Intelligence Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2022

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-28HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 114.
2021-10-28HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Intelligence. H. Rept. 117-156.
2021-09-30HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2021-09-30HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-09-29HouseReferred to the House Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select).
2021-09-29HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB5709 (Related) 2021-10-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select).

Subjects

Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Afghanistan
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Aviation and airports
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Central Intelligence Agency (CIA)
China
Coast guard
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Currency
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Energy
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Justice
Department of State
Department of the Treasury
Digital media
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Director of National Intelligence
Drug Enforcement Administration (DEA)
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Europe
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)
Federal officials
Fires
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign labor
Forests, forestry, trees
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health information and medical records
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Homeland security
Human rights
Immigration status and procedures
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Internet and video services
Iran
Iraq
Mammals
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Metals
Middle East
Military command and structure
Military operations and strategy
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Mining
National Security Agency
Neurological disorders
Pakistan
Persian Gulf
Political movements and philosophies
Public contracts and procurement
Public participation and lobbying
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Research administration and funding
Right of privacy
Russia
Sanctions
Saudi Arabia
Service animals
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Spacecraft and satellites
Strategic materials and reserves
Tajikistan
Telephone and wireless communication
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
Turkey
Turkmenistan
United Arab Emirates
Uzbekistan
Visas and passports

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback