US HB541 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 193-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Keep Families Together Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Keep Families Together Act

Sponsors

Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]
Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]
Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]
Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]
Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]
Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]
Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]
Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]
Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]
Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2019-02-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
2019-01-14HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-14HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB292 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S802-803)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback