US HB5408 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the President, when determining whether Russia is a country of particular concern for religious freedom under certain federal laws, to consider incidents occurring in the parts of Ukraine controlled by Russia or Russia-affiliated non-state groups. (The United States may take certain actions, such as withdrawing development assistance, against a country of particular concern for religious freedom.)
Title
Ukraine Religious Freedom Support Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] | Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2020-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5920) |
2020-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5408. |
2020-11-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5920-5921) |
2020-11-18 | House | Mr. Espaillat moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-03-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-12-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-12-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-12-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3064 (Same As) 2019-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Europe
Human rights
International affairs
Religion
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Ukraine
Visas and passports
Europe
Human rights
International affairs
Religion
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Ukraine
Visas and passports