US HB5399 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on September 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit certain actions that impede border security on certain Federal land, and for other purposes.
Title
National Security and Federal Lands Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS] | Rep. Patrick Fallon [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2021-09-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-09-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-09-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations. |
2021-09-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-09-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5399/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5399/BILLS-117hr5399ih.pdf |