US HB5395 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-9)
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 116 Main Street in Dansville, New York, as the "Staff Sergeant Alexandria Gleason-Morrow Post Office Building". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 116 Main Street in Dansville, New York, as the "Staff Sergeant Alexandria Gleason-Morrow Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 116 Main Street in Dansville, New York, as the "Staff Sergeant Alexandria Gleason-Morrow Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. John Faso [R-NY] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] |
Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] |
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7528) |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2018-11-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-29 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9726-9727) |
2018-11-29 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9726-9727) |
2018-11-29 | House | Committee on Oversight and Government discharged. |
2018-11-29 | House | Mr. Comer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-03-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
New York State
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
New York State
Postal service