US HB5384 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on November 24 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-11-24 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 100 Crosby Street in Mansfield, Louisiana, as the "Dr. C.O. Simpkins, Sr., Post Office". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 100 Crosby Street in Mansfield, Louisiana, as the "Dr. C.O. Simpkins, Sr., Post Office."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 100 Crosby Street in Mansfield, Louisiana, as the "Dr. C.O. Simpkins, Sr., Post Office".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-24HousePresented to President.
2020-11-19SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-11-18SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7082)
2020-09-15SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 534.
2020-09-14HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-09-14HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: H4366)
2020-09-14HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5384.
2020-09-14HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4366)
2020-09-14HouseMrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-12-19HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-12-10HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
2019-12-10HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H10006)
2019-12-10HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3365 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 444.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback