US HB5363 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 116-91. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 116-91. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permanently authorizes funding for minority-serving institutions of higher education and increases the authorization of appropriations for Pell Grants. directs the Internal Revenue Service (IRS), upon the written request of the Department of Education (ED), to disclose to any authorized person, tax return information to determine eligibility for recertifications for income-contingent or income-based repayments of student loans, discharges of loans based on total and permanent disability, and the amount of student financial aid under the Higher Education Act of 1965. The IRS must also establish and implement procedures for recertifying income for purposes of this bill and for requesting tax return information. The bill requires ED and the IRS to issue joint reports to Congress on this bill, including an update on the status of implementation of this bill and an evaluation of how such implementation affected the processing of applications for financial aid and discharge of student loans.
Title
FUTURE Act Fostering Undergraduate Talent by Unlocking Resources for Education Act
Sponsors
Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-10 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 659 (Y: 319 N: 96 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-19 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-91. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-12-19 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-12-17 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6956) |
2019-12-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 319 - 96 (Roll no. 659). (text: CR H9961-9963) |
2019-12-10 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9969) |
2019-12-10 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-12-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5363. |
2019-12-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9961-9967) |
2019-12-10 | House | Ms. Adams moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-12-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2019-12-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2486 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate amendment.
HB5368 (Related) 2019-12-09 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HR891 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5368 (Related) 2019-12-09 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HR891 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Educational facilities and institutions
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Higher education
Minority education
Student aid and college costs
Student records
Taxation
Educational facilities and institutions
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Higher education
Minority education
Student aid and college costs
Student records
Taxation