US HB5349 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on December 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-06 - Became Public Law No: 115-291.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on December 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-06 - Became Public Law No: 115-291.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1320 Autumn Avenue in Memphis, Tennessee, as the "Judge Russell B. Sugarmon Post Office Building". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1320 Autumn Avenue in Memphis, Tennessee, as the "Judge Russell B. Sugarmon Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1320 Autumn Avenue in Memphis, Tennessee, as the "Judge Russell B. Sugarmon Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] | Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] |
Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Diane Black [R-TN] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-06 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-291. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-11-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7064) |
2018-09-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 601. |
2018-09-28 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-09-13 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-13 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H8248) |
2018-09-13 | House | H.Amdt.964 On agreeing to the Russell amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-13 | House | H.Amdt.964 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Russell. (consideration: CR H8248; text: CR H8248) |
2018-09-13 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H8248-8249) |
2018-09-13 | House | Committee on Oversight and Government discharged. |
2018-09-13 | House | Mr. Russell asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-05-23 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-05-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-03-20 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E343-344) |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Judges
Postal service
Tennessee
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Judges
Postal service
Tennessee