US HB5338 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-8)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-08 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 8.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expands two programs that compensate individuals who were exposed to radiation during certain nuclear testing or uranium mining and subsequently developed medical conditions, including cancers. First, the bill expands and extends a program that compensates individuals who were exposed to radiation from atmospheric nuclear testing or other sources and subsequently developed specified cancers. Under current law, this program compensates individuals who were present in a designated geographic area during a period of nuclear testing and certain individuals employed in uranium mining. The bill expands the designated areas to include Colorado, Idaho, Montana, New Mexico, and Guam and additional areas in Arizona, Nevada, and Utah; makes more individuals who worked in uranium mining eligible for the program; increases the amount of compensation awarded to and provides medical benefits for eligible claimants; and extends for 19 years following the bill's enactment the fund that supports this program and the statute of limitations for filing claims (currently, the program terminates on July 10, 2022). Second, the bill makes certain individuals employed in uranium mines or mills eligible for a program that compensates workers, including Department of Energy employees and contractors, for illnesses caused by occupational exposure to radiation and hazardous substances during development and testing of the nation's nuclear weapons stockpile. The bill also establishes a grant program in the National Institute of Environmental Health Sciences for institutions of higher education to study the epidemiological impacts of uranium mining and milling among individuals without occupational exposure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Radiation Exposure Compensation Act Amendments of 2021

Sponsors

Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM]Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]
Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Yvette Herrell [R-NM]Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]
Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID]Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT]Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]
Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]
Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]
Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]
Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-08HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 8.
2021-12-08HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-09-23HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
2021-09-22HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-09-22HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-09-22HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-09-22HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2798 (Same As) 2021-09-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback