US HB5318 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To streamline the employer reporting process and strengthen the eligibility verification process for the premium assistance tax credit and cost-sharing subsidy.
Title
Commonsense Reporting Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-09-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-09-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3673 (Related) 2022-02-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB7774 (Related) 2022-05-13 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB7774 (Related) 2022-05-13 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5318/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5318/BILLS-117hr5318ih.pdf |