US HB5317 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to carry out a program to provide technical assistance to States and American Indian and Alaska Native tribes for the development of veteran suicide prevention activities, and for other purposes.
Title
VA Governors Challenge Expansion Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-09-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-09-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-09-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4350 (Related) 2022-03-01 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 144.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5317/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5317/BILLS-117hr5317ih.pdf |