US HB5303 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 23 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 892 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5303 with 1 hour of general debate. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. At the conclusion of general and amendment debate, the Committee of the Whole shall rise without motion. No further consideration of the bill shall be in order except pursuant to a subsequent order of the House. The amendment in the nature of a substitute printed in Rules Committee Print 114-65 shall be considered as an original bill for the purpose of amendment under the five-minute rule.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Water Resources Development Act of 2016 This bill revises or authorizes various U.S. Army Corps of Engineers water resources development projects, feasibility studies, and relationships with nonfederal project sponsors. It sets forth a process to deauthorize projects with an aggregate estimated federal cost to complete of at least $5 billion. For harbor operation and maintenance, the bill requires: utilization of priority funding for emerging harbors, an increase in funding for commercial navigation costs beginning in FY2027, and expansion of eligibility for donor port funding. The bill reauthorizes estuary habitat restoration projects through FY2021. To assist states, the bill allows: water conservation measures for drought emergencies; assistance to regional districts for flood damage reduction projects; and combined funding for drainage basins, watersheds, or ecosystems in groups of states. For flood management, the bill: allows credits or reimbursements for discrete segments of a project before final completion, authorizes the Corps of Engineers to accept nonfederal funds to revise reservoir operations and storage allocations for flood-risk and navigation, and extends the period for nonfederal interests to receive a credit in lieu of a reimbursement for the estimated federal share of a flood damage reduction project under repealed provisions the Water Resources Development Act of 1996. The bill establishes conditions to release nonfederal interests from obligations to operate and maintain the nonstructural and nonmechanical components of projects for environmental protection and restoration or aquatic ecosystem restoration. The Corps of Engineers' authority to accept funds to expedite permits is: expanded to railroad carriers, and made permanent for public utilities or natural gas companies. The Corps must designate a principal approving official to coordinate development of unmanned aircraft systems to support civil works and emergency response missions. The bill authorizes various navigation, flood risk management, hurricane and storm damage, ecosystem restoration, recreation, or river shoreline projects in Arkansas, California, Florida, Illinois, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Maine, Missouri, New Hampshire, New Jersey, North Carolina, Oregon, South Carolina, Tennessee, Texas, Washington, and Wisconsin.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water Resources Development Act of 2016

Sponsors


Roll Calls

On Passage of the Bill S. 2848 (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
On the Cloture Motion S. 2848 (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
On the Cloture Motion S.Amdt. 4979 to S. 2848 (Water Resources Development Act of 2016) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-26HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 892 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5303 with 1 hour of general debate. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. At the conclusion of general and amendment debate, the Committee of the Whole shall rise without motion. No further consideration of the bill shall be in order except pursuant to a subsequent order of the House. The amendment in the nature of a substitute printed in Rules Committee Print 114-65 shall be considered as an original bill for the purpose of amendment under the five-minute rule.
2016-09-22HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 613.
2016-09-22HouseCommittee on Natural Resources discharged.
2016-09-22HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-785, Part I.
2016-05-25HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2016-05-25HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2016-05-25HouseSubcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged.
2016-05-24HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
2016-05-24HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2016-05-23HouseReferred to House Natural Resources
2016-05-23HouseReferred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
2016-05-23HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2016-05-23HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB4417 (Related) 2016-02-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB4858 (Related) 2016-03-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB4859 (Related) 2016-03-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB5087 (Related) 2016-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB5223 (Related) 2016-05-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB5246 (Related) 2016-05-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB2848 (Related) 2016-09-19 - Held at the desk.

Subjects

Alaska
Aquatic ecology
Arkansas
Aviation and airports
Budget process
California
Congressional oversight
Dams and canals
Delaware
Disaster relief and insurance
Ecology
Emergency planning and evacuation
Floods and storm protection
Florida
Georgia
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Great Lakes
Historic sites and heritage areas
Illinois
Indian lands and resources rights
Intergovernmental relations
Iowa
Kansas
Kentucky
Lakes and rivers
Legislative rules and procedure
Licensing and registrations
Louisiana
Maine
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Massachusetts
Michigan
Missouri
National and community service
Natural disasters
Navigation, waterways, harbors
New Hampshire
New Jersey
New York State
North Carolina
Oil and gas
Oklahoma
Oregon
Pennsylvania
Public utilities and utility rates
Seashores and lakeshores
South Carolina
State and local government operations
Tennessee
Texas
Transportation safety and security
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Virginia
Washington State
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water storage
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Wisconsin
Youth employment and child labor

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback