US HB5279 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to improve cosmetic safety, and for other purposes.
Title
Cosmetic Safety Enhancement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2020-03-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-12-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-12-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB726 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1742)
Subjects
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Business records
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Cosmetics and personal care
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Government information and archives
Health
Inflation and prices
Internet and video services
Licensing and registrations
Manufacturing
Performance measurement
Product safety and quality
User charges and fees
Business records
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Cosmetics and personal care
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Government information and archives
Health
Inflation and prices
Internet and video services
Licensing and registrations
Manufacturing
Performance measurement
Product safety and quality
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5279/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5279/BILLS-116hr5279ih.pdf |