US HB5275 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Seniors Purchasing Power Protection Act - Directs the Bureau of Labor Statistics of the Department of Labor to prepare and publish a monthly Consumer Price Index for Elderly Consumers (CPI) that indicates changes over time in expenditures for consumption which are typical for individuals aged 62 years of age or older. Amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) (OASDI) to use such new CPI in the computation of cost-of-living increases for Social Security benefits.
Title
Seniors Purchasing Power Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Sestak [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. | |
2010-05-12 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security. | |
2010-05-11 | Referred to House Education and Labor | |
2010-05-11 | Referred to House Ways and Means | |
2010-05-11 | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2365 (Related) 2009-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities.
HB2429 (Related) 2009-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities.
HB4193 (Related) 2010-01-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2429 (Related) 2009-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities.
HB4193 (Related) 2010-01-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Aging
Consumer affairs
Economics and public finance
Inflation and prices
Social security and elderly assistance
Consumer affairs
Economics and public finance
Inflation and prices
Social security and elderly assistance
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/5275/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr5275/BILLS-111hr5275ih.pdf |