US HB5273 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Helping Hospitals Improve Patient Care Act of 2016 TITLE I--PROVISIONS RELATING TO MEDICARE PART A (Sec. 101) The bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to require the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to develop, with respect to claims for hospital services, codes under the Healthcare Common Procedure Coding System (HCPCS) for similar inpatient and outpatient hospital services. (Sec. 102) The bill establishes processes for adjusting a hospital's Medicare payments based on the hospital's overall proportion of inpatients who are dually eligible for Medicare and Medicaid. (Sec. 103) The bill extends for five years the Rural Community Hospital Demonstration Program, through which Medicare pays certain rural hospitals on the basis of reasonable incurred costs rather than under the standard prospective payment system. (Sec. 104) With respect to long-term care hospitals, the bill lifts a moratorium on bed increases. The bill reduces rates for high-cost outlier payments, which are additional Medicare payments made in extraordinarily high-cost cases. (Sec. 105) The bill reduces the amount by which hospital payment rates for inpatient services increase in FY2018. TITLE II--PROVISIONS RELATING TO MEDICARE PART B (Sec. 201) The bill excludes certain off-campus outpatient departments (OPDs) from specified rules that mandate lower Medicare payments. Specifically, the exclusion applies to: (1) cancer hospitals in off-campus OPDs, and (2) mid-build OPDs. A "mid-build" OPD is one for which the provider had, before a certain date, a binding written agreement with an outside party for construction. (Sec. 203) With respect to payment reductions for failing to meet requirements for the meaningful use of electronic health records (EHRs), the bill exempts eligible professionals who are based in ambulatory surgical centers. TITLE III--OTHER MEDICARE PROVISIONS (Sec. 301) Until plan year 2019, CMS may not terminate an MA plan solely because the plan failed to achieve a specified minimum quality rating. (Sec. 302) CMS must annually report on Medicare enrollment data, as specified by the bill. (Sec. 303) CMS shall: (1) request information and recommendations from stakeholders on information included in the Welcome to Medicare package, and (2) update the information included in the package accordingly.
Title
Helping Hospitals Improve Patient Care Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2016-06-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-06-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3470-3473) |
2016-06-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5273. |
2016-06-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3470-3475) |
2016-06-07 | House | Mr. Tiberi moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-06-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 470. |
2016-06-07 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2016-06-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-604, Part I. |
2016-05-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-05-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-05-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2016-05-18 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2016-05-18 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2016-05-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2016-05-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5268 (Related) 2016-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB441 (Related) 2015-02-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB672 (Related) 2015-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2506 (Related) 2015-06-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 114.
HB2580 (Related) 2015-06-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 113.
HB3291 (Related) 2015-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB202 (Related) 2015-01-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S349)
SB607 (Related) 2016-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB441 (Related) 2015-02-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB672 (Related) 2015-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2506 (Related) 2015-06-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 114.
HB2580 (Related) 2015-06-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 113.
HB3291 (Related) 2015-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB202 (Related) 2015-01-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S349)
SB607 (Related) 2016-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Building construction
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health promotion and preventive care
Hospital care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicare
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Rural conditions and development
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health promotion and preventive care
Hospital care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicare
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Rural conditions and development