US HB5271 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act, as amended by the Patient Protection and Affordability Care Act (PPACA) and the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010, to postpone from December 31, 2010, to December 31, 2012, the date by which physician-owned hospitals must have a service provider agreement in order to participate in Medicare under a rural provider and hospital exception to the prohibition against physician-ownership of or -investment in a hospital, if they also meet certain requirements addressing conflicts of interest, bona fide investments, patient safety issues, and expansion limitations.
Title
To amend section 1877 of the Social Security Act to delay by 2 years the expansion cut-off date imposed by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2010-05-11 | Referred to House Ways and Means | |
2010-05-11 | Referred to House Energy and Commerce | |
2010-05-11 | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Medical ethics
Medicare
Rural conditions and development
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Medical ethics
Medicare
Rural conditions and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/5271/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr5271/BILLS-111hr5271ih.pdf |