US HB525 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Temporarily increases the applicable Federal Medical Assistance Percentage (i.e., federal matching rate) under Medicaid for certain approved home- and community-based services that are provided between October 1, 2020, and September 30, 2022. As a condition for receiving the increased rate, a state must agree to undertake activities to improve the delivery of such services during and after the public health emergency relating to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019), such as by providing additional benefits to home health workers and by helping individuals who were relocated to nursing facilities during the emergency move back to their homes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID HCBS Relief Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2021-01-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2021-01-28HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB151 (Same As) 2021-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback