US HB5248 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sustainable Shark Fisheries and Trade Act
Title
Sustainable Shark Fisheries and Trade Act
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] |
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] |
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] |
Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] |
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] |
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-03-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2018-03-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-03-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2764 (Related) 2018-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 733.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5248/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5248/BILLS-115hr5248ih.pdf |