US HB5246 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Federal Meat Inspection Act to allow the interstate sale of State-inspected meat, and for other purposes.
Title
Expanding Markets for State-Inspected Meat Processors Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture. |
2021-09-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2021-09-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1998 (Related) 2021-05-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
SB107 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB107 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5246/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5246/BILLS-117hr5246ih.pdf |