US HB524 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 54-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Local Control of Education Act Local Control of Education Act Amends the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 (ESEA) to prohibit the federal government from directly or indirectly mandating, directing, controlling, incentivizing, or conditioning federal support on a state's, local educational agency's (LEA's), or school's adoption of: the Common Core State Standards, any other academic standards common to a number of states, or any statewide or nationally recognized content standards; or any assessment, instructional content, or curriculum aligned to, or based on, specific academic standards. Amends the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 to make those prohibitions applicable to grants awarded under the Race to the Top program for innovations and reforms in elementary and secondary education. Prohibits the Secretary of Education from conditioning the provision of a statutory or regulatory waiver under the ESEA on a state, LEA, Indian tribe, or school adopting any specific instructional content, academic standard, assessment, curriculum, or program of instruction. Makes that prohibition applicable to future and previously issued waivers.
Title
Local Control of Education Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. |
2015-01-28 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H643) |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB73 (Same As) 2015-01-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Intergovernmental relations
School administration
State and local government operations
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Intergovernmental relations
School administration
State and local government operations
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/524/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr524/BILLS-114hr524ih.pdf |