US HB5239 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Public Health Service Act to limit the liability of health care professionals who volunteer to provide health care services in response to a disaster.
Title
Good Samaritan Health Professionals Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] |
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] |
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2021-09-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-09-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-09-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2941 (Same As) 2021-10-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5239/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5239/BILLS-117hr5239ih.pdf |