US HB5227 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 101-0)
Status: Introduced on September 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Personal Responsibility and Work Opportunity Reconciliation Act of 1996 to provide certain benefits to noncitizens, and for other purposes.
Title
LIFT the BAR Act of 2021 Lifting Immigrant Families Through Benefits Access Restoration Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2021-10-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations. |
2021-09-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-09-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-09-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4311 (Related) 2022-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB9474 (Related) 2022-12-08 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB9474 (Related) 2022-12-08 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5227/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5227/BILLS-117hr5227ih.pdf |