US HB5147 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-07 - Became Public Law No: 114-235. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-07 - Became Public Law No: 114-235. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
BABIES Act Bathrooms Accessible in Every Situation Act (Sec. 2) This bill requires restrooms in a public building to be equipped with baby changing facilities that the General Services Administration (GSA) determines are physically safe, sanitary, and appropriate. "Public building" means a public building controlled by the GSA's Public Building Service. Such requirement shall be subject to any reasonable accommodations that may be made for individuals in accordance with the Americans with Disabilities Act. Such requirement shall be inapplicable: to a restroom in a public building that is not available or accessible for public use, to a restroom that contains clear and conspicuous signage indicating where a restroom with a baby changing table is located on the same floor of such building, if new construction would be required to install a baby changing facility in the building and the cost of such construction is unfeasible, or to a building not subject to an alteration for which any appropriations must be approved by the Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works and the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Title
BABIES Act Bathrooms Accessible in Every Situation Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] |
Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] |
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] |
Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] |
Roll Calls
2016-09-21 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 389 N: 34 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 389 N: 34 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 389 N: 34 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-07 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-235. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-10-07 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-10-03 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6255-6256) |
2016-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2016-09-21 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 34 (Roll no. 541). (text: CR 09/20/2016 H5701) |
2016-09-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5767-5768) |
2016-09-20 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2016-09-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5147. |
2016-09-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5701-5702) |
2016-09-20 | House | Mr. Barletta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-09-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 605. |
2016-09-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-774. |
2016-09-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-09-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-09-14 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2016-05-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2016-04-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2016-04-29 | House | Introduced in House |