US HB5146 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the past performance of a small business concern to be taken into account in certain situations. Specifically, when a small business previously participated in a joint venture, an agency's contracting officer must consider the past performance of the joint venture when evaluating the small business's offer for a prime contract. In addition, a small business that performed as a first-tier subcontractor for an agency contract may request that the prime contractor submit to a contracting agency a record of past performance, and the agency's contracting officer must consider such record when evaluating an offer by the small business for a prime contract.
Title
Unlocking Opportunities for Small Businesses Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2020-01-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-01-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H39) |
2020-01-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5146. |
2020-01-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H39-41) |
2020-01-08 | House | Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-12-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 286. |
2019-12-19 | House | Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 116-361. |
2019-11-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-11-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2019-11-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Commerce
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Small Business Administration
Commerce
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Small Business Administration