US HB5141 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 186-21)
Status: Introduced on August 31 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 384.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Public Health Service Act to expand the allowable use criteria for new access points grants for community health centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maximizing Outcomes through Better Investments in Lifesaving Equipment for (MOBILE) Health Care Act

Sponsors

Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA]
Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]
Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]
Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT]
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC]
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU]
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Ernest Gonzales [R-TX]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]
Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Troy Carter [D-LA]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. David Price [D-NC]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC]
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Jake Auchincloss [D-MA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Peter Meijer [R-MI]Rep. Carolyn Bourdeaux [D-GA]
Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. John Joyce [R-PA]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC]
Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL]Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC]Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]
Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]
Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY]
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI]
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]
Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Young Kim [R-CA]
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY]
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Cori Bush [D-MO]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]
Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]
Rep. Frank Mrvan [D-IN]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]
Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Michelle Steel [R-CA]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-09-28HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 384.
2022-09-28HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-513.
2022-09-21HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 52 - 0.
2022-09-21HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2022-09-14HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 29 - 0 .
2022-09-14HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-09-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2021-08-31HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2021-08-31HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB958 (Same As) 2022-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 117-204.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback