US HB5139 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes formal sexual assault and harassment policies for the transportation industry. Among other things, the bill requires certain passenger transportation carriers, including passenger airlines and vessels, buses, commuter and intercity passenger railroads, and transportation network companies (e.g., Uber or Lyft) to establish formal policies, training, and reporting structures regarding sexual assault and harassment; sets forth civil penalties for individuals who physically assault or sexually assault-or threaten to assault transportation personnel; directs the Department of Transportation to collect information on the number of sexual assault and harassment incidents reported by the carriers and make such information publicly available; and expands the reporting process for individuals involved in transportation sexual assault or harassment incidents by allowing such individuals to report allegations to law enforcement in a manner that protects their privacy and confidentiality.
Title
Stop Sexual Assault and Harassment in Transportation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] |
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] |
Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2020-10-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-10-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5183-5186) |
2020-10-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5139. |
2020-10-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5183-5188) |
2020-10-01 | House | Mr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-07-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 371. |
2020-07-29 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2020-07-29 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-463, Part I. |
2019-12-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-11-20 | House | Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Discharged. |
2019-11-20 | House | Subcommittee on Aviation Discharged. |
2019-11-20 | House | Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Discharged. |
2019-11-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-11-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-20 | House | Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Discharged. |
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2019-11-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Aviation and airports
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Employment and training programs
Evidence and witnesses
Government information and archives
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Marine and inland water transportation
Motor carriers
Public transit
Railroads
Sex offenses
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Aviation and airports
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Employment and training programs
Evidence and witnesses
Government information and archives
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Marine and inland water transportation
Motor carriers
Public transit
Railroads
Sex offenses
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security