US HB5122 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Farm Security and Rural Investment Act of 2002 to improve assistance to community wood facilities, and for other purposes.
Title
Community Wood Facilities Assistance Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2021-08-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2021-08-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-08-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2223 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4778)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5122/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5122/BILLS-117hr5122ih.pdf |