US HB5119 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend title 31, United States Code, to provide small businesses with additional time to file beneficial ownership information, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protect Small Business and Prevent Illicit Financial Activity Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-12-12 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended RC# 713 (Y: 420 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-13SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
2023-12-12HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2023-12-12HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 1 (Roll no. 713). (text: 12/11/2023 CR H6752)
2023-12-12HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6834-6835)
2023-12-11HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2023-12-11HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5119.
2023-12-11HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6752-6753)
2023-12-11HouseMr. Nunn (IA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2023-12-11HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 244.
2023-12-11HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 118-303.
2023-09-20HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 47 - 0.
2023-09-20HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2023-08-01HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2023-08-01HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3625 (Related) 2024-01-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback