US HB5114 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
21st Century Conservation Service Corps Act of 2016 This bill establishes a 21st Century Conservation Service Corps (21CSC) that provides work and training opportunities for youth and veterans in certain federal agencies. Work and training provided in 21CSC must involve: protecting, restoring, and enhancing natural, cultural, and historical resources and treasures, including public and tribal land or water; supporting outdoor recreation and urban green spaces; restoring and safeguarding U.S. natural resources; or service that is primarily indoors with a clear benefit for natural, cultural, or historic resources or treasures. Participating federal agencies may develop public-private partnerships with organizations to support and carry out 21CSC projects. Participating federal agencies must compensate 21CSC participants with a wage, a stipend, a living allowance, or an educational credit at a participating institution of higher education. Participating federal agencies must also provide participants with: (1) job skill development; (2) community skill development to help participants acquire an ethic of service to others and become more effective resource and community stewards; and (3) a greater understanding of U.S. natural, cultural, or historic resources or treasures.
Title
21st Century Conservation Service Corps Act of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Ryan Zinke [R-MT] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2016-05-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2016-05-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2016-05-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2016-04-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2016-04-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1993 (Related) 2016-03-17 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Subjects
Disaster relief and insurance
Employment and training programs
Historical and cultural resources
Indian lands and resources rights
Land use and conservation
National and community service
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Youth employment and child labor
Employment and training programs
Historical and cultural resources
Indian lands and resources rights
Land use and conservation
National and community service
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Youth employment and child labor
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/5114/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr5114/BILLS-114hr5114ih.pdf |