US HB510 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 23, United States Code, to modify the percentages of funds to be allocated to certain urbanized areas under the surface transportation block grant program.
Title
Support Local Transportation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1931 (Related) 2021-10-06 - By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 117-41.
SB1953 (Related) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1953 (Related) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/510/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr510/BILLS-117hr510ih.pdf |