US HB51 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 217-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the admission of the State of Washington, D.C. into the Union.
Title
Washington, D.C. Admission Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - On passage (Y: 216 N: 208 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 205 N: 215 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-04-22 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 205 N: 215 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2021-04-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-04-22 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 216 - 208 (Roll no. 132). (text: CR H2061-2071) |
2021-04-22 | House | On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 205 - 215 (Roll no. 131). |
2021-04-22 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered without objection. |
2021-04-22 | House | Mr. Griffith moved to recommit to the Committee on Oversight and Reform. (text: CR H2081-2088) |
2021-04-22 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2021-04-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 51. |
2021-04-22 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 51, H.R. 1573 and H.R. 1333. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The previous question on each measure is considered ordered without intervening motions except one hour of debate and a motion to recommit. H. Res. 316 and H. Con. Res. 30 are adopted. |
2021-04-22 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 330. (consideration: CR H2061-2089) |
2021-04-21 | House | Supplemental report filed by the Committee on Oversight and Reform, H. Rept. 117-19, Part II. |
2021-04-20 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 330 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 51, H.R. 1573 and H.R. 1333. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The previous question on each measure is considered ordered without intervening motions except one hour of debate and a motion to recommit. H. Res. 316 and H. Con. Res. 30 are adopted. |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 6. |
2021-04-16 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2021-04-16 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2021-04-16 | House | Committee on Armed Services discharged. |
2021-04-16 | House | Committee on Rules discharged. |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Reform. H. Rept. 117-19, Part I. |
2021-04-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 19. |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2021-01-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-01-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, Armed Services, the Judiciary, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-01-04 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1) |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB51 (Same As) 2021-06-22 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held.
HR330 (Related) 2021-04-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR330 (Related) 2021-04-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.