US HB5099 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Enhancing DHS' Fusion Center Technical Assistance Program Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to direct the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to establish a fusion center technical assistance program. DHS, in carrying out the program, shall: (1) provide technical assistance to fusion centers regarding grants administered under the Urban Areas Security Initiative and the Homeland Security Grant Program, terrorism prevention activities, and intelligence and information sharing; (2) provide to fusion centers notice of any changes to such activities; and (3) make available best practices regarding fusion center operations, information sharing and analysis of homeland security threats, and protecting privacy, civil rights, and civil liberties.
Title
Enhancing DHS' Fusion Center Technical Assistance Program Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-03-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-03-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1665) |
2018-03-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5099. |
2018-03-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1665-1666) |
2018-03-19 | House | Mr. Estes (KS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-03-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 459. |
2018-03-19 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-603. |
2018-03-07 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-03-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-07 | House | Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence Discharged. |
2018-03-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence. |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2018-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |