US HB5089 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on July 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 722.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Federal Insecticide, Fungicide, and Rodenticide Act and the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to clarify Congressional intent regarding the regulation of the use of pesticides in or near navigable waters, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reducing Regulatory Burdens Act of 2023

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-12-16HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 722.
2024-12-16HouseCommittee on Agriculture discharged.
2024-12-16HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 118-885, Part I.
2024-01-31HouseOrdered to be Reported.
2024-01-31HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2024-01-31HouseSubcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged
2023-09-19HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Research, and Biotechnology.
2023-07-31HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2023-07-28HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2023-07-28HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback