US HB5072 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To create an equitable and stable rental housing market, and for other purposes.
Title
A Just Society: A Place to Prosper Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2019-12-05 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H9284) |
2019-11-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-11-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Consumer affairs
Environmental health
Government corporations and government-sponsored enterprises
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Housing discrimination
Housing finance and home ownership
Housing industry and standards
Housing supply and affordability
Immigration status and procedures
Landlord and tenant
Lawyers and legal services
Life, casualty, property insurance
Low- and moderate-income housing
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public housing
Real estate business
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Securities
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Transportation programs funding
User charges and fees
Wages and earnings
Civil actions and liability
Consumer affairs
Environmental health
Government corporations and government-sponsored enterprises
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Housing discrimination
Housing finance and home ownership
Housing industry and standards
Housing supply and affordability
Immigration status and procedures
Landlord and tenant
Lawyers and legal services
Life, casualty, property insurance
Low- and moderate-income housing
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public housing
Real estate business
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Securities
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Transportation programs funding
User charges and fees
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5072/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5072/BILLS-116hr5072ih.pdf |