US HB5072 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Liberian Refugee Immigration Fairness Act of 2018 This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security to adjust to permanent resident status a qualifying Liberian national who: (1) has been continuously present in the United States between November 20, 2014, through the date of status adjustment application; or (2) is the spouse, child, or unmarried son or daughter of such an alien. Adjustment applications must be filed not later than one year after the date of enactment of this bill.
Title
Liberian Refugee Immigration Fairness Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2275 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S24)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Africa
Department of Homeland Security
Foreign labor
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Liberia
Africa
Department of Homeland Security
Foreign labor
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Liberia
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5072/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5072/BILLS-115hr5072ih.pdf |