US HB5067 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To transition military veterans into new careers in education, and for other purposes.
Title
TEAMS Act Troops Educating And Managing Schools Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-12-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2019-11-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, the Judiciary, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, the Judiciary, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, the Judiciary, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, the Judiciary, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2869 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Educational guidance
Elementary and secondary education
Employee hiring
Government information and archives
Health personnel
Inflation and prices
Law enforcement officers
Licensing and registrations
School administration
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Vocational and technical education
Wages and earnings
Congressional oversight
Educational guidance
Elementary and secondary education
Employee hiring
Government information and archives
Health personnel
Inflation and prices
Law enforcement officers
Licensing and registrations
School administration
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Vocational and technical education
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5067/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5067/BILLS-116hr5067ih.pdf |