US HB5065 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Small Business Administration, in coordination with the Bureau of Prisons, to require the Service Corps of Retired Executives to provide entrepreneurship counseling and training services to formerly incarcerated individuals.
Title
Prison to Proprietorship for Formerly Incarcerated Act
Sponsors
Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] | Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL] |
Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2020-01-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-01-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H35) |
2020-01-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5065. |
2020-01-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H35-37) |
2020-01-08 | House | Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-12-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 273. |
2019-12-12 | House | Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 116-343. |
2019-11-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-11-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2019-11-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Business education
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Employment and training programs
Intergovernmental relations
Small business
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Employment and training programs
Intergovernmental relations
Small business