US HB5059 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State Insurance Regulation Preservation Act This bill amends the Home Owners' Loan Act to limit the applicability of reporting and filing requirements for insurance savings and loan holding companies (ISLHCs). Such holding companies shall also be exempt from requirements relating to examination and supervision by the Federal Reserve Board (FRB) if they meet certain state and federal capital requirements. Certain FRB regulations as applied to ISLHCs must be tailored to the insurance business and applicable state insurance requirements.
Title
State Insurance Regulation Preservation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] |
Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2018-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8124-8125) |
2018-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5059. |
2018-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8124-8127) |
2018-09-12 | House | Mr. Rothfus moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-09-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 728. |
2018-09-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-937. |
2018-07-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-07-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2018-02-15 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E194) |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business records
Corporate finance and management
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
Insurance industry and regulation
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business records
Corporate finance and management
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
Insurance industry and regulation