US HB5053 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on August 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To enhance protections for election records.
Title
Protecting Election Administration from Interference Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] |
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2021-08-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-08-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2626 (Same As) 2021-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB2747 (Related) 2021-10-20 - Motion by Senator Schumer to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to S. 2747 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 420) entered in Senate.
HB5746 (Related) 2022-01-19 - Motion to proceed to consideration of the motion to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment to H.R. 5746 (Record Vote No. 9) withdrawn in Senate.
SB2747 (Related) 2021-10-20 - Motion by Senator Schumer to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to S. 2747 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 420) entered in Senate.
HB5746 (Related) 2022-01-19 - Motion to proceed to consideration of the motion to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment to H.R. 5746 (Record Vote No. 9) withdrawn in Senate.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5053/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5053/BILLS-117hr5053ih.pdf |