US HB5026 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Introduced on July 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 533.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 533.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fish Hatchery Protection Act - Prohibits the Secretary of the Interior from permanently closing, reprograming, repurposing, decommissioning, significantly altering, or moving to caretaker status any fish and other aquatic species propagation hatchery or propagation program within the National Fish Hatchery System unless such action is expressly authorized by an Act of Congress. Makes this Act effective from November 1, 2013, to 10 years after this Act's enactment.
Title
Fish Hatchery Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Tim Griffin [R-AR] | Rep. Joseph Heck [R-NV] |
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] | Rep. Nick Rahall [D-WV] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] |
Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] | Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 533. |
2014-12-22 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-702. |
2014-07-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 17. |
2014-07-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-07-30 | House | Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged. |
2014-07-23 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2014-07-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2014-07-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Aquaculture
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources