US HB501 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes for FY2020-FY2024 and revises the national toll-free phone number, public awareness campaign, and grant program relating to poison control centers. Among other changes, the bill supports enhancements of the national toll-free phone number, such as texting capabilities; expands the public awareness campaign to include education about drug misuse; and authorizes poison control centers and professional organizations to use grant funds for preventing and treating the misuse of opioids and other drugs.
Title
Poison Center Network Enhancement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] |
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2019-02-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-02-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2052-2053) |
2019-02-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 501. |
2019-02-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2052-2053) |
2019-02-25 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Emergency communications systems
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Telephone and wireless communication
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Telephone and wireless communication