US HB4996 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 46, United States Code, with respect to prohibited acts by ocean common carriers or marine terminal operators, and for other purposes.
Title
Ocean Shipping Reform Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-08 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 364 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2021-12-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-12-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 364 - 60 (Roll no. 406). (text: CR H7473-7475) |
2021-12-08 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7528-7529) |
2021-12-08 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-12-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4996. |
2021-12-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7472-7479) |
2021-12-08 | House | Mr. Garamendi moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-08-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2021-08-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-08-10 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E888) |
2021-08-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3580 (Related) 2022-06-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-146.
HB6865 (Related) 2022-03-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB6865 (Related) 2022-03-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.