US HB4991 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting Research and Development for First Responders Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to direct the Department of Homeland Security to designate the National Urban Security Technology Laboratory, previously known as the Environmental Measurements Laboratory, as an additional laboratory. The laboratory shall: (1) conduct tests, evaluations, and assessments of current and emerging technologies, including cybersecurity of such technologies that can connect to the Internet, for emergency response providers; (2) conduct research and development on radiological and nuclear response and recovery; and (3) act as a technical advisor to emergency response providers.
Title
Supporting Research and Development for First Responders Act
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-06-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5266) |
2018-06-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4991. |
2018-06-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5266-5267) |
2018-06-19 | House | Mr. Donovan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-06-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 589. |
2018-06-14 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-756. |
2018-06-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-06-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-06 | House | Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications Discharged. |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications. |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2018-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |