US HB4990 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To codify the Institute for Telecommunication Sciences and to direct the Assistant Secretary of Commerce for Communications and Information to establish an initiative to support the development of emergency communication and tracking technologies, and for other purposes.
Title
Institute for Telecommunication Sciences Codification Act ITS Codification Act
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2022-07-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-07-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7184) |
2022-07-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4990. |
2022-07-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7184-7185) |
2022-07-27 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-07-26 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 341. |
2022-07-26 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-437. |
2022-07-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 51 - 0. |
2022-07-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-06-15 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 0 . |
2022-06-15 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-08-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2021-08-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-08-10 | House | Introduced in House |