US HB4989 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 705.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 705.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting Diplomats from Surveillance Through Consumer Devices Act Short Titles as Introduced Protecting Diplomats from Surveillance Through Consumer Devices Act This bill directs the Department of State to: (1) establish a policy on the use of location-tracking consumer devices, including GPS-enabled devices, at U.S. diplomatic and consular facilities by U.S. government employees, contractors, locally employed staff, and members of other agencies deployed to or stationed at such facilities; and (2) submit a related report to Congress. Existing and new employees at such facilities shall, as a part of their security briefings, be informed of such policy and given instructions on the use of location-tracking consumer devices on and off facility premises. The State Department may coordinate policy formulation with other agencies whose employees are deployed to or stationed at U.S. diplomatic and consular facilities.
Title
Protecting Diplomats from Surveillance Through Consumer Devices Act Short Titles as Introduced Protecting Diplomats from Surveillance Through Consumer Devices Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
Roll Calls
2018-07-17 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 335 (Y: 412 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 705. |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2018-07-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 0 (Roll no. 335). (text: CR H6319) |
2018-07-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6344) |
2018-07-17 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-07-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4989. |
2018-07-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6319-6320) |
2018-07-17 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-05-17 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules,. |
2018-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2018-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
Telephone and wireless communication
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
Telephone and wireless communication