US HB4974 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Introduced on November 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires prescribers of controlled substances, as a condition of obtaining or renewing their registration with the Drug Enforcement Administration, to complete specified education or training on the prevention, treatment, and management of opioid-use and other substance-use disorders. This education and training shall also satisfy the training requirements currently needed to obtain waivers to prescribe certain medication-assisted treatments for opioid-use disorders in settings other than opioid treatment programs.
Title
MATE Act of 2019 Medication Access and Training Expansion Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
Rep. Harold Rogers [R-KY] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] |
Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] |
Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] |
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] |
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-11-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-11-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4640 (Related) 2020-09-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Alternative treatments
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employment and training programs
Health
Health personnel
Higher education
Licensing and registrations
Medical education
Nursing
Prescription drugs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Alternative treatments
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employment and training programs
Health
Health personnel
Higher education
Licensing and registrations
Medical education
Nursing
Prescription drugs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4974/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4974/BILLS-116hr4974ih.pdf |