US HB497 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Kinzinger asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 497, a bill originally introduced by Representative Hunter, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

BRAVE Act of 2019 Burial Rights for America's Veterans' Efforts Act of 2019 This bill increases the amounts payable through the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) for (1) burial and funeral expenses of veterans, and (2) such expenses in connection with a veteran's death due to a service-connected disability. The VA shall also increase such amounts each fiscal year to account for inflation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BRAVE Act of 2019 Burial Rights for America's Veterans' Efforts Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28HouseASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Kinzinger asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 497, a bill originally introduced by Representative Hunter, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
2019-02-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
2019-01-11HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-01-11HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB598 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback